NJ S278 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous S4142

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-3)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-10-26 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes certain rights for students with military obligations attending public institutions of higher education and permits late registration for students with military obligations.*

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishes certain rights for students with military obligations attending public institutions of higher education and permits late registration for students with military obligations.*

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-10-26 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-08 - Assembly - Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - Senate - Senate Higher Eduction Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-10-26AssemblyReported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
2020-10-08AssemblyReported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
2020-03-05AssemblyReceived in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
2020-03-05SenatePassed by the Senate (40-0)
2020-02-13SenateReported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
2020-01-30SenateReferred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
2020-01-30SenateReported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2020-01-14SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Higher Education Committee

Same As/Similar To

S4142 (Carry Over) 2019-10-24 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Higher Education Committee
A3807 (Same As) 2020-10-26 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback