NJ S2762 | 2010-2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 23 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-06-13 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Housing and Local Government Committee
Pending: Assembly Housing and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 23 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-06-13 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Housing and Local Government Committee
Pending: Assembly Housing and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Permits municipality to pay commercial and industrial property tax refunds for tax years 2010 through 2011 over subsequent three local budget years. *
Title
Permits municipality to pay commercial and industrial property tax refunds for tax years 2010 through 2011 over subsequent three local budget years. *
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-05-23 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 25 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-13 | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Housing and Local Government Committee | |
2011-05-23 | Passed by the Senate (25-12) | |
2011-05-12 | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading | |
2011-03-10 | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4084 (Same As) 2011-05-23 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Housing and Local Government Committee