NJ S275 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous S4096

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on March 1 2021 - 75% progression
Action: 2021-03-01 - Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (70-0-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Provides resident tuition rate to certain non-resident dependent children of United States military personnel attending public institutions of higher education.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Provides resident tuition rate to certain non-resident dependent children of United States military personnel attending public institutions of higher education.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-01 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A2142 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-26 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-08 - Assembly - Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - Senate - Senate Higher Eduction Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-01AssemblyPassed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (70-0-0)
2021-03-01AssemblySubstituted for A2142
2020-10-26AssemblyReported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
2020-10-08AssemblyReported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
2020-02-13AssemblyReceived in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
2020-02-10SenatePassed by the Senate (38-0)
2020-01-30SenateReported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
2020-01-14SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Higher Education Committee

Same As/Similar To

S4096 (Carry Over) 2019-09-10 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Higher Education Committee
A2142 (Same As) 2021-03-01 - Substituted by S275

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback