NJ S2713 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-01 - Approved P.L.2021, c.28.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on March 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-01 - Approved P.L.2021, c.28.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Allows for cashless payment at certain sports and entertainment venues.
Title
Allows for cashless payment at certain sports and entertainment venues.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-01-11 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A4631 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-11 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 9 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-12-15 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-30 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-28 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-11 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 62 N: 9 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-12-15 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-30 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-28 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-01 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2021, c.28. |
2021-01-11 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (62-9-4) |
2021-01-11 | Assembly | Substituted for A4631 |
2020-12-14 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2020-12-14 | Assembly | Transferred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2020-07-30 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Consumer Affairs Committee |
2020-07-30 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (39-1) |
2020-07-28 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2020-07-28 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4631 (Same As) 2021-01-11 - Substituted by S2713