NJ S2709 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 13 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-13 - Approved P.L.2023, c.22.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on March 13 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-13 - Approved P.L.2023, c.22.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Permits appointment of additional alternate deputy registrars.
Title
Permits appointment of additional alternate deputy registrars.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-01-26 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-26 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A4524 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-12-12 - Assembly - Assembly State and Local Government Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-10-17 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-09-29 - Senate - Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-26 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A4524 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-12-12 - Assembly - Assembly State and Local Government Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-10-17 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-09-29 - Senate - Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-13 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2023, c.22. |
2023-01-26 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (78-0-0) |
2023-01-26 | Assembly | Substituted for A4524 |
2022-12-12 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2022-10-20 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee |
2022-10-17 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (37-0) |
2022-09-29 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2022-05-26 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4524 (Same As) 2023-01-26 - Substituted by S2709