NJ S2656 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on December 17 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-01-15 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
Pending: Assembly State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes 35 member New Jersey Puerto Rico Commission in Department of State.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishes 35 member New Jersey Puerto Rico Commission in Department of State.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-12-17 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-09-27 - Senate - Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-01-15AssemblyReceived in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
2018-12-17SenatePassed by the Senate (40-0)
2018-09-27SenateReported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
2018-06-04SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee

Same As/Similar To

A4188 (Same As) 2018-06-18 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback