NJ S2654 | 2014-2015 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S99
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 25 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-01-07 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 25 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-01-07 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes "Atlantic City Growth Tax Credit Program" to grant tax credits to promote the development of non-rental housing in Atlantic City.
Title
Establishes "Atlantic City Growth Tax Credit Program" to grant tax credits to promote the development of non-rental housing in Atlantic City.
Sponsors
Sen. James Whelan [D] | Sen. Robert Singer [R] | Sen. Nilsa Cruz-Perez [D] | Sen. James Beach [D] |
Sen. Diane Allen [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-01-07 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-12-10 - Assembly - Assembly Housing and Community Development Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 34 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-25 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 34 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-12 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-12-10 - Assembly - Assembly Housing and Community Development Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 34 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-25 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 34 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-12 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 11 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-07 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2015-12-10 | Assembly | Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2015-06-25 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Housing and Community Development Committee |
2015-06-25 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (34-4) |
2015-05-14 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2015-01-15 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2015-01-15 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2015-01-13 | Senate | Transferred to Senate Economic Growth Committee |
2014-12-15 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2654 (Carry Over) 2016-01-07 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
A4004 (Same As) 2016-01-07 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
A4004 (Same As) 2016-01-07 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading