NJ S2652 | 2024-2025 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Enrolled on September 26 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-09-26 - Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (76-0-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on September 26 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-09-26 - Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (76-0-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Revises statutory terms pertaining to sexual exploitation or abuse of children.
Title
Revises statutory terms pertaining to sexual exploitation or abuse of children.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-09-26 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-09-26 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A3539 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-13 - Assembly - Assembly Children, Families and Food Security Committee Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-20 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-07 - Senate - Senate Law and Public Safety Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-09-26 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A3539 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-06-13 - Assembly - Assembly Children, Families and Food Security Committee Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-05-20 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-07 - Senate - Senate Law and Public Safety Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-09-26 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (76-0-0) |
2024-09-26 | Assembly | Substituted for A3539 |
2024-06-13 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2024-05-20 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Children, Families and Food Security Committee |
2024-05-20 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (37-0) |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2024-02-12 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A3539 (Same As) 2024-09-26 - Substituted by S2652