NJ S2648 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S682
Note: Carry Foward to future A4604
Note: Carry Over of previous A3866
Note: Carry Over of previous S2467
Note: Carry Foward to future A4604
Note: Carry Over of previous A3866
Note: Carry Over of previous S2467
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on June 30 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-30 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Pending: Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 30 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-30 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Pending: Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires suicide prevention training for mental health practitioners.
Title
Requires suicide prevention training for mental health practitioners.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-30 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2648 (Carry Over) 2020-06-30 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
S2648 (Carry Over) 2020-06-30 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
A1443 (Same As) 2020-02-24 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
A3866 (Carry Over) 2018-05-07 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Human Services Committee
S2467 (Carry Over) 2018-04-12 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
S2648 (Carry Over) 2020-06-30 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
A1443 (Same As) 2020-02-24 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
A3866 (Carry Over) 2018-05-07 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Human Services Committee
S2467 (Carry Over) 2018-04-12 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2020/S2648 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2020/S3000/2648_I1.HTM |