NJ S2637 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A1457
Note: Carry Over of previous A729
Note: Carry Over of previous A729
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on June 4 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-12-17 - Substituted by A557 (2R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 4 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-12-17 - Substituted by A557 (2R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires the adoption of nepotism policies by school districts and charter schools.
Title
Requires the adoption of nepotism policies by school districts and charter schools.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-12-06 - Senate - Senate Education Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-12-17 | Senate | Substituted by A557 (2R) |
2018-12-06 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2018-06-04 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2637 (Carry Over) 2018-12-17 - Substituted by A557 (2R)
A557 (Same As) 2019-03-04 - Received in the Senate, 2nd Reading - Concur. w/Gov's Recom.
A729 (Carry Over) 2017-06-05 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
A557 (Same As) 2019-03-04 - Received in the Senate, 2nd Reading - Concur. w/Gov's Recom.
A729 (Carry Over) 2017-06-05 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading