NJ S2611 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on June 25 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-25 - Substituted by A4556/4145 (ACS)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 25 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-25 - Substituted by A4556/4145 (ACS)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires BPU to establish and maintain electronic public document search system on its website; requires BPU to provide certain notice of its meetings and hold quarterly public comment meeting.
Title
Requires BPU to establish and maintain electronic public document search system on its website; requires BPU to provide certain notice of its meetings and hold quarterly public comment meeting.
Sponsors
Sen. Robert Smith [D] | Sen. Christopher Bateman [R] | Sen. Troy Singleton [D] | Sen. Nellie Pou [D] |
Sen. Linda Greenstein [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-22 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-17 - Senate - Senate Environment and Energy Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-17 - Senate - Senate Environment and Energy Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-25 | Senate | Substituted by A4556/4145 (ACS) |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2020-09-21 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2020-09-17 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2020-07-06 | Senate | Transferred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee |
2020-06-25 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4556 (Same As) 2021-05-12 - Approved P.L.2021, c.96.
A4145 (Same As) 2020-10-19 - Combined with A4556 (ACS)
A4145 (Same As) 2020-10-19 - Combined with A4556 (ACS)