NJ A4556 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-3)
Status: Passed on May 12 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-12 - Approved P.L.2021, c.96.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-3)
Status: Passed on May 12 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-12 - Approved P.L.2021, c.96.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Requires BPU to establish and maintain electronic public records access service on its website; requires BPU to provide certain notice of its meetings and hearings and allow public comment.
Title
Requires BPU to establish and maintain electronic public records access service on its website; requires BPU to provide certain notice of its meetings and hearings and allow public comment.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S2611 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-29 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-19 - Assembly - Assembly Telecommunications and Utilities Committee: Reported with Substitution (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S2611 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-29 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-19 - Assembly - Assembly Telecommunications and Utilities Committee: Reported with Substitution (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-12 | Senate | Approved P.L.2021, c.96. |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (37-0) |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Substituted for S2611 (1R) |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2020-11-05 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2020-10-29 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (72-0-0) |
2020-10-19 | Assembly | Reported from Assembly Comm. as a Substitute, 2nd Reading |
2020-08-24 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Telecommunications and Utilities Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2611 (Same As) 2021-03-25 - Substituted by A4556/4145 (ACS)