NJ S2597 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on June 22 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-16 - Substituted by A4589
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 22 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-11-16 - Substituted by A4589
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Extends time period during which seasonal retail consumption license holders may sell alcoholic beverages following COVID-19 pandemic.
Title
Extends time period during which seasonal retail consumption license holders may sell alcoholic beverages following COVID-19 pandemic.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-11-09 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 8 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-21 - Senate - Senate Law and Public Safety Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-09-21 - Senate - Senate Law and Public Safety Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-11-16 | Senate | Substituted by A4589 |
2020-11-09 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2020-09-21 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2020-09-21 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2020-06-22 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4589 (Same As) 2020-12-30 - Approved P.L.2020, c.146.