NJ A4589 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-2)
Status: Passed on December 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-12-30 - Approved P.L.2020, c.146.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-2)
Status: Passed on December 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-12-30 - Approved P.L.2020, c.146.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Extends time period during which seasonal retail consumption license holders may sell alcoholic beverages following COVID-19 pandemic.
Title
Extends time period during which seasonal retail consumption license holders may sell alcoholic beverages following COVID-19 pandemic.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-11-16 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S2597 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-11-16 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 28 N: 9 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-29 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 21 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-26 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-08 - Assembly - Assembly Oversight, Reform and Federal Relations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-08 - Assembly - Assembly Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-11-16 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 28 N: 9 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-29 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 21 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-26 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-08 - Assembly - Assembly Oversight, Reform and Federal Relations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-08 - Assembly - Assembly Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-30 | Senate | Approved P.L.2020, c.146. |
2020-11-16 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (28-9) |
2020-11-16 | Senate | Substituted for S2597 |
2020-11-05 | Senate | Received in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2020-10-29 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (49-21-0) |
2020-10-26 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2020-10-08 | Assembly | Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2020-08-25 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Oversight, Reform and Federal Relations Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2597 (Same As) 2020-11-16 - Substituted by A4589