NJ S2594 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on June 22 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-08-27 - Substituted by A2370 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 22 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-08-27 - Substituted by A2370 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes compassionate release program for certain inmates; repeals law that establishes medical parole.
Title
Establishes compassionate release program for certain inmates; repeals law that establishes medical parole.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-08-24 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-27 | Senate | Substituted by A2370 (1R) |
2020-08-25 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2020-07-09 | Senate | Transferred to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2020-06-22 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A2370 (Same As) 2020-10-19 - Approved P.L.2020, c.106.