NJ S2593 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on May 12 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-29 - Substituted by A3990 (ACS/1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 12 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-29 - Substituted by A3990 (ACS/1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides temporary one-year extension of service life of school buses for 2022-2023 school year; authorizes chief administrator to allow one-year extension in subsequent two school years.
Title
Provides temporary one-year extension of service life of school buses for 2022-2023 school year; authorizes chief administrator to allow one-year extension in subsequent two school years.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-27 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-09 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee: Reported with Substitution (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-06-09 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee: Reported with Substitution (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-29 | Senate | Substituted by A3990 (ACS/1R) |
2022-06-27 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2022-06-09 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2022-06-09 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee as a Substitute, 2nd Reading |
2022-05-12 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Transportation Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A3990 (Same As) 2022-06-30 - Approved P.L.2022, c.41.