NJ S2589 | 2014-2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on December 7 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-12-10 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Women and Children Committee
Pending: Assembly Women and Children Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on December 7 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-12-10 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Women and Children Committee
Pending: Assembly Women and Children Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires DOH to establish pilot program to test feasibility of increasing number of contracted early intervention service providers in areas experiencing significant population growth.*
Title
Requires DOH to establish pilot program to test feasibility of increasing number of contracted early intervention service providers in areas experiencing significant population growth.*
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-12-07 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-25 - Senate - Senate Amend (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-25 - Senate - Senate Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-09 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-26 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-25 - Senate - Senate Amend (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-25 - Senate - Senate Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-09 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-26 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-12-10 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Women and Children Committee |
2015-12-07 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (35-0) |
2015-09-24 | Senate | Senate Amendment (32-0) (Singer) |
2015-06-25 | Senate | Senate Amendment (32-0) (Singer) |
2015-03-09 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2015-01-29 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2015-01-29 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2014-12-08 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4443 (Same As) 2015-05-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Women and Children Committee