NJ S2576 | 2014-2015 | Regular Session

Note: Legislation replaced by A3895

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on December 1 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-06-25 - Substituted by A3895
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Removes provisions of law relating to Atlantic City Alliance.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Removes provisions of law relating to Atlantic City Alliance.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2014-12-08 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-06-25SenateSubstituted by A3895
2014-12-08SenateReported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
2014-12-01SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee

Same As/Similar To

A3985 (Same As) 2016-01-17 - Cond. Veto, Passed Both House, No Action Taken By Governor
A3895 (Replaced by) 2014-12-04 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Women and Children Committee

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback