NJ S2576 | 2010-2011 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-3)
Status: Enrolled on June 29 2011 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-08-25 - Conditional Veto, Received in the Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Prohibits drilling technique of hydraulic fracturing.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prohibits drilling technique of hydraulic fracturing.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2011-06-29 - Senate - Senate Table Motion (Y: 22 N: 15 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-29 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 58 N: 13 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-29 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 33 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2011-08-25 Conditional Veto, Received in the Senate
2011-06-29 Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (58-11-8)
2011-06-29 Substituted for A3653 (2R)
2011-06-29 Received in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading
2011-06-29 Passed by the Senate (33-1)
2011-06-29 Motion To Table (22-15) (Buono)
2011-06-29 Motion To Sa (Kyrillos)
2011-03-10 Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
2010-12-20 Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee

Same As/Similar To

A3313 (Same As) 2010-10-07 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback