NJ S2552 | 2012-2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 7 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-30 - Substituted by A3788 (2R)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-30 - Substituted by A3788 (2R)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Codifies regulation exempting firearms records from State's open public records law. *
Title
Codifies regulation exempting firearms records from State's open public records law. *
Sponsors
Sen. Jeff Van Drew [D] | Sen. Steven Oroho [R] | Sen. Jennifer Beck [R] | Sen. Michael Doherty [R] |
Sen. Fred Madden [D] |
Roll Calls
2013-05-13 - Senate - Senate Amend (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 18 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-13 - Senate - Senate Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-05-13 - Senate - Senate Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-30 | Senate | Substituted by A3788 (2R) |
2013-05-13 | Senate | Senate Amendment (22-0) (Weinberg) |
2013-05-09 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2013-04-15 | Senate | Transferred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee |
2013-02-07 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A3788 (Same As) 2013-08-08 - Approved P.L.2013, c.116.