NJ S249 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous S3929

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 10 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-02-13 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Human Services Committee
Pending: Assembly Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Requires pharmacy benefits manager providing services within Medicaid program to disclose certain information to DHS.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires pharmacy benefits manager providing services within Medicaid program to disclose certain information to DHS.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-27 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-13AssemblyReceived in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Human Services Committee
2020-02-10SenatePassed by the Senate (39-0)
2020-01-27SenateReported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2020-01-14SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee

Same As/Similar To

S3929 (Carry Over) 2019-06-13 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
A1259 (Same As) 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Human Services Committee

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback