NJ S2483 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A3339
Note: Carry Foward to future S940
Note: Carry Over of previous S4234
Note: Carry Foward to future S940
Note: Carry Over of previous S4234
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Introduced on May 12 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-06-20 - Motion To Table (17-15) (Ruiz)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 12 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-06-20 - Motion To Table (17-15) (Ruiz)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes "Parents Bill of Rights Act"; prohibits school district from interfering with fundamental right of parent or guardian to engage in and direct student's education; permits opt-out of school district curriculum.
Title
Establishes "Parents Bill of Rights Act"; prohibits school district from interfering with fundamental right of parent or guardian to engage in and direct student's education; permits opt-out of school district curriculum.
Sponsors
Sen. Kristin Corrado [R] | Sen. Anthony M. Bucco [R] | Sen. James Holzapfel [R] | Sen. Steven Oroho [R] |
Sen. Michael Testa [R] | Sen. Edward Durr [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor: Table Motion (Y: 17 N: 15 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-20 | Senate | Motion To Table (17-15) (Ruiz) |
2023-06-20 | Senate | Motion To Relieve from Committee (Bucco) |
2022-05-12 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2483 (Carry Over) 2023-06-20 - Motion To Table (17-15) (Ruiz)
S2483 (Carry Over) 2023-06-20 - Motion To Table (17-15) (Ruiz)
S4234 (Carry Over) 2021-12-06 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee
A5110 (Same As) 2023-01-23 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Education Committee
S2483 (Carry Over) 2023-06-20 - Motion To Table (17-15) (Ruiz)
S4234 (Carry Over) 2021-12-06 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee
A5110 (Same As) 2023-01-23 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Education Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2022/S2483 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2022/S2500/2483_I1.HTM |
Roll Call | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2022/S2483 |