NJ S2422 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S389
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on November 21 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-11-21 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee
Pending: Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on November 21 2016 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-11-21 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee
Pending: Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires recycling of scrap tires and licensing of scrap tire haulers.
Title
Requires recycling of scrap tires and licensing of scrap tire haulers.
Sponsors
Sen. Fred Madden [D] | Sen. Brian Stack [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-11-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 21 N: 12 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-11-03 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-10-13 - Senate - Senate Environment and Energy Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-11-03 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-10-13 - Senate - Senate Environment and Energy Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-11-21 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee |
2016-11-21 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (21-12) |
2016-11-03 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2016-10-13 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2016-10-13 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2016-06-27 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2422 (Carry Over) 2016-11-21 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee
A4093 (Same As) 2016-09-15 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee
A4093 (Same As) 2016-09-15 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee