NJ S2414 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Introduced on May 7 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-30 - Substituted by A4869 (2R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 7 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-30 - Substituted by A4869 (2R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires certain bidders for prevailing wage public work to provide proof that prevailing wage will be paid.
Title
Requires certain bidders for prevailing wage public work to provide proof that prevailing wage will be paid.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-03 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-08 - Senate - Senate Labor Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-08 - Senate - Senate Labor Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-30 | Senate | Substituted by A4869 (2R) |
2021-06-03 | Senate | Senate Amendment (26-0) (Singleton) |
2020-10-08 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2020-05-07 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Labor Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4869 (Same As) 2021-11-08 - Approved P.L.2021, c.301.