NJ S2392 | 2024-2025 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous S3394
Note: Carry Over of previous A4944
Note: Carry Over of previous A4944
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-29 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Pending: Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-29 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Pending: Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes medical cannabis for treatment of sickle cell anemia.
Title
Authorizes medical cannabis for treatment of sickle cell anemia.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-29 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S3394 (Carry Over) 2022-12-15 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
A4944 (Carry Over) 2022-12-08 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health Committee
A913 (Same As) 2025-03-20 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
A4944 (Carry Over) 2022-12-08 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health Committee
A913 (Same As) 2025-03-20 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2024/S2392 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2024/S2500/2392_I1.HTM |