NJ S2389 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-1)
Status: Passed on January 21 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-01-21 - Approved P.L.2019, c.404.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Requires New Jersey State Board of Pharmacy to establish prescription drug pricing disclosure website and certain pharmaceutical manufacturing companies to provide prescription drug price information.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires New Jersey State Board of Pharmacy to establish prescription drug pricing disclosure website and certain pharmaceutical manufacturing companies to provide prescription drug price information.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-01-13 - Senate - Senate Floor: Adopt Governor Recommendations (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-13 - Senate - Senate Floor: Concur Governor Recommendations (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-13 - Senate - Senate Floor: Reconsidered Vote (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-13 - Senate - Senate Floor: Concur Governor Recommendations (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-13 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Concur Governor Recommendations (Y: 70 N: 1 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-16 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A5449 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-16 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 74 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-05 - Assembly - Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-10 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-03 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-01-21AssemblyApproved P.L.2019, c.404.
2020-01-13AssemblyPassed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (70-1-3)
2020-01-13AssemblyMotion Suspend 22:4b (71-2-1) (Downey)
2020-01-13AssemblyReceived in the Assembly on Concurrence with Gov. Recommend.
2020-01-13SenatePassed by the Senate (40-0
2020-01-13Senate2nd Reading in the Senate on Concur. w/Governor's Recommend. (39-0)
2020-01-13SenateReconsidered Vote (39-0)
2020-01-13SenatePassed by the Senate (40-0)
2020-01-09SenateConditional Veto, Received in the Senate
2019-12-16AssemblyPassed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (74-1-1)
2019-12-16AssemblySubstituted for A5449 (1R)
2019-12-05AssemblyReported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
2019-06-13AssemblyReceived in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee
2019-06-10SenatePassed by the Senate (36-0)
2019-06-03SenateReported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2018-04-05SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee

Same As/Similar To

A5449 (Same As) 2019-12-16 - Substituted by S2389 (1R)

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback