NJ S2380 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-1)
Status: Passed on September 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-14 - Approved P.L.2020, c.84.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Concerns employment benefits and coronavirus disease 2019 infections contracted by essential employees.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Concerns employment benefits and coronavirus disease 2019 infections contracted by essential employees.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-07-30 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 42 N: 27 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-30 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A3999 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-30 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 27 N: 12 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-27 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-14 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 27 N: 10 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-12 - Senate - Senate Labor Committee: Reported with Substitution (Y: 3 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-09-14SenateApproved P.L.2020, c.84.
2020-07-30SenatePassed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (27-12)
2020-07-30SenateReceived in the Senate, 2nd Reading on Concurrence
2020-07-30AssemblyPassed by the Assembly (42-27-6)
2020-07-30AssemblySubstituted for A3999 (ACS)
2020-07-27AssemblyReported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2020-07-27AssemblyTransferred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
2020-05-28AssemblyReceived in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Labor Committee
2020-05-14SenatePassed by the Senate (27-10)
2020-05-11SenateReported from Senate Committee as a Substitute, 2nd Reading
2020-05-11SenateTransferred to Senate Labor Committee
2020-05-04SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee

Same As/Similar To

A3999 (Same As) 2020-07-30 - Substituted by S2380 (SCS/1R)

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback