NJ S238 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S381
Note: Carry Over of previous S3320
Note: Carry Over of previous A4946
Note: Carry Over of previous S3320
Note: Carry Over of previous A4946
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on November 20 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-11-20 - Approved P.L.2020, c.126.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on November 20 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-11-20 - Approved P.L.2020, c.126.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Revises law governing training and duties of Junior Firefighters' Auxiliary members.
Title
Revises law governing training and duties of Junior Firefighters' Auxiliary members.
Sponsors
Sen. Troy Singleton [D] | Sen. Paul Sarlo [D] | Rep. Gary Schaer [D] | Sen. Christopher Bateman [R] |
Sen. Michael Doherty [R] | Sen. Anthony M. Bucco [R] | Sen. Linda Greenstein [D] | Sen. Steven Oroho [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-10-29 - Senate - Senate Floor: Concur in Assembly Amendments (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-29 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-29 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A1106 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-29 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-19 - Assembly - Assembly Homeland Security and State Preparedness Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - Senate - Senate Law and Public Safety Committee: Reported with Substitution (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-29 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-29 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A1106 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-29 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-19 - Assembly - Assembly Homeland Security and State Preparedness Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-10 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-30 - Senate - Senate Law and Public Safety Committee: Reported with Substitution (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-11-20 | Senate | Approved P.L.2020, c.126. |
2020-10-29 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (34-0) |
2020-10-29 | Senate | Received in the Senate, 2nd Reading on Concurrence |
2020-10-29 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (72-0-0) |
2020-10-29 | Assembly | Substituted for A1106 (ACS) |
2020-10-19 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2020-02-13 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Homeland Security and State Preparedness Committee |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (39-0) |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee as a Substitute, 2nd Reading |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S238 (Carry Over) 2020-11-20 - Approved P.L.2020, c.126.
S3320 (Carry Over) 2019-01-15 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
A1106 (Same As) 2020-10-29 - Substituted by S238 (SCS/1R)
A2899 (Same As) 2020-02-20 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee
A4946 (Carry Over) 2019-01-24 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Homeland Security and State Preparedness Committee
S3320 (Carry Over) 2019-01-15 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
A1106 (Same As) 2020-10-29 - Substituted by S238 (SCS/1R)
A2899 (Same As) 2020-02-20 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee
A4946 (Carry Over) 2019-01-24 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Homeland Security and State Preparedness Committee