NJ S2375 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on March 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-13 - Approved P.L.2017, c.31.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on March 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-13 - Approved P.L.2017, c.31.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Dissolves New Jersey Hall of Fame Advisory Commission and New Jersey Hall of Fame corporation and transfers their functions to Foundation for New Jersey Hall of Fame.
Title
Dissolves New Jersey Hall of Fame Advisory Commission and New Jersey Hall of Fame corporation and transfers their functions to Foundation for New Jersey Hall of Fame.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-01-23 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute For A3961 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-23 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-11-13 - Assembly - Assembly State and Local Government Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-10-20 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-09-29 - Senate - Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-23 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-11-13 - Assembly - Assembly State and Local Government Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-10-20 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-09-29 - Senate - Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-13 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2017, c.31. |
2017-01-23 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (70-0-0) |
2017-01-23 | Assembly | Substituted for A3961 |
2016-11-14 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2016-10-20 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee |
2016-10-20 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (38-0) |
2016-09-29 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2016-06-16 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A3961 (Same As) 2017-01-23 - Substituted by S2375