NJ S2369 | 2024-2025 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous S1674
Note: Carry Over of previous A691
Note: Carry Over of previous A691
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 29 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-29 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
Pending: Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-29 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
Pending: Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires local government notification of sex offender registration and prohibits sex offenders from living near schools, child care centers or playgrounds.
Title
Requires local government notification of sex offender registration and prohibits sex offenders from living near schools, child care centers or playgrounds.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-29 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S1674 (Carry Over) 2022-02-14 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
A691 (Carry Over) 2022-01-11 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee
A4389 (Same As) 2024-05-16 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee
A691 (Carry Over) 2022-01-11 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee
A4389 (Same As) 2024-05-16 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2024/S2369 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2024/S2500/2369_I1.HTM |