NJ S2365 | 2014-2015 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S627
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Enrolled on January 29 2015 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-16 - Conditional Veto, Received in the Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on January 29 2015 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-16 - Conditional Veto, Received in the Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires AG oversight of transfer of federal surplus military equipment to local law enforcement agencies; establishes review and reporting requirement.
Title
Requires AG oversight of transfer of federal surplus military equipment to local law enforcement agencies; establishes review and reporting requirement.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-01-29 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute For A3754 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-29 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-29 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-29 - Assembly - Assembly Substitute For A3754 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-12 - Assembly - Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-18 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-18 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-11 - Senate - Senate Law and Public Safety Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-29 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-29 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-29 - Assembly - Assembly Substitute For A3754 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-12 - Assembly - Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-18 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-18 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-11 - Senate - Senate Law and Public Safety Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-16 | Senate | Conditional Veto, Received in the Senate |
2015-01-29 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (70-0-0) |
2015-01-29 | Assembly | Substituted for A3754 |
2015-01-12 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2015-01-12 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee |
2014-12-18 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (37-0) |
2014-12-11 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2014-09-18 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2365 (Carry Over) 2015-03-16 - Conditional Veto, Received in the Senate
A3754 (Same As) 2015-01-29 - Substituted by S2365
A3754 (Same As) 2015-01-29 - Substituted by S2365