NJ A3754 | 2014-2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on October 2 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-01-29 - Substituted by S2365
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on October 2 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-01-29 - Substituted by S2365
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires AG oversight of transfer of federal surplus military equipment to local law enforcement agencies; establishes review and reporting requirement.
Title
Requires AG oversight of transfer of federal surplus military equipment to local law enforcement agencies; establishes review and reporting requirement.
Sponsors
Sen. Gordon Johnson [D] | Rep. Ronald Dancer [R] | Rep. Wayne DeAngelo [D] | Rep. Craig Coughlin [D] |
Rep. Reed Gusciora [D] |
Roll Calls
2015-01-12 - Assembly - Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-01-29 | Assembly | Substituted by S2365 |
2015-01-12 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2015-01-12 | Assembly | Transferred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee |
2014-10-02 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Homeland Security and State Preparedness Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2365 (Same As) 2015-03-16 - Conditional Veto, Received in the Senate