NJ S2347 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-3)
Status: Engrossed on April 13 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-05-11 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes Employment and Business-Related Tax Deferral Assistance Program in EDA to allow small businesses to defer the payment and remittance of certain employment and business-related taxes during COVID-19 public health emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishes Employment and Business-Related Tax Deferral Assistance Program in EDA to allow small businesses to defer the payment and remittance of certain employment and business-related taxes during COVID-19 public health emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-05-11 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-04-13 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-11AssemblyReported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
2020-05-07AssemblyTransferred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
2020-04-13AssemblyReceived in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Commerce and Economic Development Committee
2020-04-13SenatePassed by the Senate (38-0)
2020-04-09SenateIntroduced, 1st Reading without Reference, 2nd Reading

Same As/Similar To

A4030 (Same As) 2020-05-11 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback