NJ A4030 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Introduced on May 4 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-05-20 - Substituted by S2347 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes Employment and Business-Related Tax Deferral Assistance Program in EDA to allow small businesses to defer the payment and remittance of certain employment and business-related taxes during COVID-19 public health emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishes Employment and Business-Related Tax Deferral Assistance Program in EDA to allow small businesses to defer the payment and remittance of certain employment and business-related taxes during COVID-19 public health emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-05-18 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-05-11 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-20AssemblySubstituted by S2347 (1R)
2021-05-18AssemblyReported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2021-05-18AssemblyRecommitted to Assembly Appropriations Committee
2020-05-11AssemblyReported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
2020-05-04AssemblyIntroduced, Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee

Same As/Similar To

S2347 (Same As) 2021-11-08 - Absolute Veto, Received in the Senate

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback