NJ S2342 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A2513
Note: Carry Foward to future S3106
Note: Carry Over of previous A1800
Note: Carry Over of previous S1901
Note: Carry Foward to future S3106
Note: Carry Over of previous A1800
Note: Carry Over of previous S1901
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on March 21 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-21 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
Pending: Senate Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 21 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-21 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
Pending: Senate Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides employers with various tax incentives for hiring persons with disabilities under insurance premiums tax, corporation business tax and gross income tax.
Title
Provides employers with various tax incentives for hiring persons with disabilities under insurance premiums tax, corporation business tax and gross income tax.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-21 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2342 (Carry Over) 2022-03-21 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
S2342 (Carry Over) 2022-03-21 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
A904 (Same As) 2022-01-11 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Commerce and Economic Development Committee
A1800 (Carry Over) 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Commerce and Economic Development Committee
S1901 (Carry Over) 2020-02-24 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
S2342 (Carry Over) 2022-03-21 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
A904 (Same As) 2022-01-11 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Commerce and Economic Development Committee
A1800 (Carry Over) 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Commerce and Economic Development Committee
S1901 (Carry Over) 2020-02-24 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2022/S2342 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2022/S2500/2342_I1.HTM |