NJ S232 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous S1700
Note: Carry Over of previous A5094
Note: Carry Over of previous A5094
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Passed on September 18 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-18 - Approved P.L.2020, c.92.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Passed on September 18 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-09-18 - Approved P.L.2020, c.92.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Requires DEP to evaluate environmental and public health stressors of certain facilities on overburdened communities when reviewing certain permit applications.
Title
Requires DEP to evaluate environmental and public health stressors of certain facilities on overburdened communities when reviewing certain permit applications.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-08-27 - Senate - Senate Floor: Concur in Assembly Amendments (Y: 21 N: 14 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-27 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A2212 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-27 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 28 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-27 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 21 N: 14 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-24 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-20 - Assembly - Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-29 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 22 N: 14 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-25 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Substitution (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - Senate - Senate Environment and Energy Committee: Reported with Substitution (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-27 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A2212 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-27 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 28 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-27 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 21 N: 14 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-24 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-20 - Assembly - Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 4 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-29 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 22 N: 14 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-25 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Substitution (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-24 - Senate - Senate Environment and Energy Committee: Reported with Substitution (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-09-18 | Senate | Approved P.L.2020, c.92. |
2020-08-27 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (21-14) |
2020-08-27 | Senate | Received in the Senate, 2nd Reading on Concurrence |
2020-08-27 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (49-28-1) |
2020-08-27 | Assembly | Substituted for A2212 (ACS/1R) |
2020-08-24 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2020-08-24 | Assembly | Recommitted to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2020-07-20 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2020-07-02 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee |
2020-06-29 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (22-14) |
2020-06-25 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee as a Substitute, 2nd Reading |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2020-02-24 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee as a Substitute, 2nd Reading |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S1700 (Carry Over) 2019-01-24 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
A2212 (Same As) 2020-08-27 - Substituted by S232 (SCS/2R)
A5094 (Carry Over) 2019-02-25 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee
A2212 (Same As) 2020-08-27 - Substituted by S232 (SCS/2R)
A5094 (Carry Over) 2019-02-25 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee