NJ S2313 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-23 - Approved P.L.2018, c.16.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes zero emission certificate program for nuclear power plants.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishes zero emission certificate program for nuclear power plants.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-12 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A3724 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-12 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 28 N: 9 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-12 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 60 N: 10 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-04-05 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-05-23AssemblyApproved P.L.2018, c.16.
2018-04-12AssemblyPassed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (60-10-1)
2018-04-12AssemblySubstituted for A3724
2018-04-12AssemblyReceived in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading
2018-04-12SenatePassed by the Senate (28-9)
2018-04-05SenateReported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
2018-03-22SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee

Same As/Similar To

A3724 (Same As) 2018-04-12 - Substituted by S2313

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback