NJ S2309 | 2012-2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on November 19 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-01-13 - Substituted by A3254
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 19 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-01-13 - Substituted by A3254
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Permits municipal court to order certain offenders to perform community service in lieu of payment of penalty.
Title
Permits municipal court to order certain offenders to perform community service in lieu of payment of penalty.
Sponsors
Sen. Joseph Vitale [D] | Sen. Barbara Buono [D] | Sen. Christopher Bateman [R] | Sen. Brian Stack [D] |
Sen. Shirley Turner [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-13 | Senate | Substituted by A3254 |
2013-12-12 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2012-11-19 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A3254 (Same As) 2014-01-17 - Approved P.L.2013, c.255.
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2012/S2309 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2012/S2500/2309_I1.HTM |