NJ S2297 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Passed on August 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-08 - Approved P.L.2019, c.213.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Passed on August 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-08 - Approved P.L.2019, c.213.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes NJ Blockchain Initiative Task Force.
Title
Establishes NJ Blockchain Initiative Task Force.
Sponsors
Sen. Thomas Kean [R] | Sen. James Beach [D] | Rep. Timothy Eustace [D] | Rep. Reed Gusciora [D] |
Rep. Valerie Huttle [D] | Sen. Andrew Zwicker [D] | Sen. Gordon Johnson [D] | Rep. Herbert Conaway [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A3613 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-17 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-03 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-09-27 - Senate - Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-17 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-03 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-09-27 - Senate - Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-08-08 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2019, c.213. |
2019-05-23 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (75-0-0) |
2019-05-23 | Assembly | Substituted for A3613 (3R) |
2019-01-15 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2018-12-17 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (39-1) |
2018-12-03 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2018-09-27 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2018-09-27 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2018-03-13 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A3613 (Same As) 2019-05-23 - Substituted by S2297 (2R)