NJ S2271 | 2010-2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on September 26 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-11-10 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Housing and Local Government Committee
Pending: Assembly Housing and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on September 26 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-11-10 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Housing and Local Government Committee
Pending: Assembly Housing and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires owner of building advised of structural safety concern during private inspection to notify municipal code official and DCA; provides for emergency inspection.*
Title
Requires owner of building advised of structural safety concern during private inspection to notify municipal code official and DCA; provides for emergency inspection.*
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-09-26 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 33 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-11-10 | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Housing and Local Government Committee | |
2011-09-26 | Passed by the Senate (33-5) | |
2011-09-22 | Reported from Senate Committee as a Substitute, 2nd Reading | |
2011-01-20 | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee | |
2011-01-20 | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading | |
2010-09-20 | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A3396 (Same As) 2010-10-18 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Housing and Local Government Committee