NJ S2244 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on March 8 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-25 - Substituted by A3292 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Requires prescription opioid medications include warning sticker advising patients of risk of addiction and overdose.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Requires prescription opioid medications include warning sticker advising patients of risk of addiction and overdose.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-18 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-25SenateSubstituted by A3292 (1R)
2019-03-18SenateReported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2018-06-14SenateTransferred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
2018-03-08SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee

Same As/Similar To

A3292 (Same As) 2019-05-23 - Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (77-0-0)

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback