NJ S2227 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A285
Note: Carry Foward to future S417
Note: Carry Over of previous S3894
Note: Carry Foward to future S417
Note: Carry Over of previous S3894
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Engrossed on June 29 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-29 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
Pending: Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 29 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-29 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
Pending: Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates permanent commission to study various statutory definitions of veteran, disabled veteran, and service-disabled veteran.
Title
Creates permanent commission to study various statutory definitions of veteran, disabled veteran, and service-disabled veteran.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-06-29 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-21 - Senate - Senate Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-21 - Senate - Senate Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-29 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee |
2022-06-29 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (40-0) |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2227 (Carry Over) 2022-06-29 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
S2227 (Carry Over) 2022-06-29 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
S3894 (Carry Over) 2021-06-10 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
A3873 (Same As) 2022-05-09 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
S2227 (Carry Over) 2022-06-29 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
S3894 (Carry Over) 2021-06-10 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
A3873 (Same As) 2022-05-09 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee