NJ S2224 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A2556
Note: Carry Over of previous S1956
Note: Carry Over of previous S1956
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 16 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-01-10 - Substituted by A259
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 16 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-01-10 - Substituted by A259
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides civil service preference to military service members who did not serve in theater of operation but received campaign or expedition medal.
Title
Provides civil service preference to military service members who did not serve in theater of operation but received campaign or expedition medal.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-11-15 - Senate - Senate Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-10 | Senate | Substituted by A259 |
2021-11-15 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2020-03-16 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A259 (Same As) 2022-01-18 - Approved P.L.2021, c.429.
A2556 (Carry Over) 2018-02-01 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
S1956 (Carry Over) 2018-02-22 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
A2556 (Carry Over) 2018-02-01 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
S1956 (Carry Over) 2018-02-22 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee