NJ S2209 | 2010-2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on September 30 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-10-07 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Housing and Local Government Committee
Pending: Assembly Housing and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on September 30 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-10-07 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Housing and Local Government Committee
Pending: Assembly Housing and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Eliminates five percent down payment requirement for bond ordinances approved by counties and municipalities.
Title
Eliminates five percent down payment requirement for bond ordinances approved by counties and municipalities.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-09-30 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 22 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-10-07 | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Housing and Local Government Committee | |
2010-09-30 | Passed by the Senate (22-15) | |
2010-08-23 | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading | |
2010-07-19 | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |