NJ S2200 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A2412
Note: Carry Foward to future S416
Note: Carry Over of previous S1411
Note: Carry Over of previous A1841
Note: Carry Foward to future S416
Note: Carry Over of previous S1411
Note: Carry Over of previous A1841
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 7 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-09 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 7 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-09 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Allows gross income tax deduction for amounts paid for removal of lead, asbestos, sodium, chloride, and other contaminants from taxpayer's property.
Title
Allows gross income tax deduction for amounts paid for removal of lead, asbestos, sodium, chloride, and other contaminants from taxpayer's property.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-09 - Senate - Senate Environment and Energy Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-09 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2023-03-09 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2200 (Carry Over) 2023-03-09 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
S2200 (Carry Over) 2023-03-09 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
A799 (Same As) 2022-01-11 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Community Development and Affairs Committee
S1411 (Carry Over) 2022-01-10 - Substituted by A1841 (3R)
A1841 (Carry Over) 2022-01-10 - Passed by the Senate (39-0)
S2200 (Carry Over) 2023-03-09 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
A799 (Same As) 2022-01-11 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Community Development and Affairs Committee
S1411 (Carry Over) 2022-01-10 - Substituted by A1841 (3R)
A1841 (Carry Over) 2022-01-10 - Passed by the Senate (39-0)