NJ A1841 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session

Note: Carry Foward to future A799
Note: Carry Foward to future S2200
Note: Carry Over of previous A5417
Note: Carry Over of previous S3973

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-3)
Status: Engrossed on March 25 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2022-01-10 - Passed by the Senate (39-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Allows gross income tax deduction for amounts paid for removal of lead, asbestos, sodium, chloride, and other contaminants from taxpayer's property.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Allows gross income tax deduction for amounts paid for removal of lead, asbestos, sodium, chloride, and other contaminants from taxpayer's property.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2022-01-10 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-10 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S1411 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-11-08 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-15 - Senate - Senate Environment and Energy Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-17 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-12-14 - Assembly - Assembly Community Development and Affairs Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-12-14 - Assembly - Assembly Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-01-10SenatePassed by the Senate (39-0)
2022-01-10SenateSubstituted for S1411 (2R)
2021-11-08SenateReported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2021-06-15SenateReferred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
2021-06-15SenateReported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
2021-04-26SenateReceived in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee
2021-03-25AssemblyPassed by the Assembly (73-0-0)
2021-03-17AssemblyReported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2020-12-14AssemblyReported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
2020-12-14AssemblyTransferred to Assembly Community Development and Affairs Committee
2020-01-14AssemblyIntroduced, Referred to Assembly Health Committee

Same As/Similar To

A1841 (Carry Over) 2022-01-10 - Passed by the Senate (39-0)
A1841 (Carry Over) 2022-01-10 - Passed by the Senate (39-0)
A5417 (Carry Over) 2019-05-20 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee
S1411 (Same As) 2022-01-10 - Substituted by A1841 (3R)
S3973 (Carry Over) 2019-06-20 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback