NJ S2199 | 2010-2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Passed on August 18 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-08-18 - Approved P.L.2011, c.113.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Passed on August 18 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-08-18 - Approved P.L.2011, c.113.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes NJ Advisory Council on End-of-Life Care in DHSS.
Title
Establishes NJ Advisory Council on End-of-Life Care in DHSS.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-06-29 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 72 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-09 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 34 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-09 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 34 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-08-18 | Approved P.L.2011, c.113. | |
2011-06-29 | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (36-0) | |
2011-06-29 | Received in the Senate, 2nd Reading on Concurrence | |
2011-06-29 | Passed by the Assembly (72-6-0) | |
2011-06-23 | Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Spencer) | |
2011-06-23 | Substituted for A3839 (1R) | |
2011-06-13 | Received in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading | |
2011-06-09 | Passed by the Senate (34-0) | |
2011-06-02 | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading | |
2010-07-19 | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A3839 (Same As) 2011-06-23 - Substituted by S2199 (1R)