NJ S2192 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S410
Note: Carry Foward to future A4010
Note: Carry Over of previous A2372
Note: Carry Over of previous S4009
Note: Carry Foward to future A4010
Note: Carry Over of previous A2372
Note: Carry Over of previous S4009
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 16 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-16 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Transportation Committee
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 16 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-16 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Transportation Committee
Pending: Senate Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires DOT to inspect traffic signs and establish public awareness campaign concerning traffic signs in need of maintenance.
Title
Requires DOT to inspect traffic signs and establish public awareness campaign concerning traffic signs in need of maintenance.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-16 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Transportation Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2192 (Carry Over) 2020-03-16 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Transportation Committee
S2192 (Carry Over) 2020-03-16 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Transportation Committee
A662 (Same As) 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee
A2372 (Carry Over) 2018-02-01 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee
S4009 (Carry Over) 2019-06-24 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Transportation Committee
S2192 (Carry Over) 2020-03-16 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Transportation Committee
A662 (Same As) 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee
A2372 (Carry Over) 2018-02-01 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee
S4009 (Carry Over) 2019-06-24 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Transportation Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2020/S2192 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2020/S2500/2192_I1.HTM |