NJ S2188 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous S2343
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on May 13 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-16 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Labor Committee
Pending: Assembly Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 13 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-05-16 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Labor Committee
Pending: Assembly Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Concerns notification of employees of procedures for wage claims.
Title
Concerns notification of employees of procedures for wage claims.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-13 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-11 - Senate - Senate Labor Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-11 - Senate - Senate Labor Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-16 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Labor Committee |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (35-0) |
2018-06-11 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Labor Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2343 (Carry Over) 2016-06-09 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Labor Committee