NJ S2181 | 2012-2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on September 20 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-12-19 - Substituted by A2132 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on September 20 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-12-19 - Substituted by A2132 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires BPU to promulgate regulations requiring electricity providers to provide information so customers can compare prices and services.
Title
Requires BPU to promulgate regulations requiring electricity providers to provide information so customers can compare prices and services.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-12-19 | Senate | Substituted by A2132 (1R) |
2013-12-16 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2012-09-20 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A2132 (Same As) 2014-01-13 - Approved P.L.2013, c.184.
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2012/S2181 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2012/S2500/2181_I1.HTM |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2012/S2500/2181_R1.HTM |